Global Patent Index - EP 0983838 A2

EP 0983838 A2 2000-03-08 - Method for preparation of colored contact lens with a dazzling appearance

Title (en)

Method for preparation of colored contact lens with a dazzling appearance

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von gefärbten Kontakt-Linsen mit einem blendenden Erscheinungsbild

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de lentilles de contact colorés avec un aspect éblouissant

Publication

EP 0983838 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99108336 A

Priority

US 14565398 A

Abstract (en)

A method for preparation of colored contact lens with a dazzling appearance is disclosed. Pigments are first printed to a convex surface of a plastic mold. Material for the lens is then dropped onto the concave surface of the plastic mold. The mold then spins in a determined speed for a determined period of time, such that a desired radius surface is formed. During the spinning, the pigments are distributed inside the lens material due to the centrifugal force so generated, at positions determined generally by the diameters of the particles, such that a dazzling appearance may be obtained. This invention also discloses the contact lens prepared according to the method of this invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29D 11/00 (2006.01); D06P 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/44 (2013.01); B29D 11/00115 (2013.01); B29D 11/00317 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983838 A2 20000308; EP 0983838 A3 20020102; EP 0983838 B1 20051228; CN 1120994 C 20030910; CN 1252530 A 20000510; DE 69929125 D1 20060202; DE 69929125 T2 20060831

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160428

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160428

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69929125

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69929125 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030610

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI