Global Patent Index - EP 0983846 A1

EP 0983846 A1 2000-03-08 - Rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine rotative d'impression

Publication

EP 0983846 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116321 A

Priority

  • DE 19840310 A
  • US 38528999 A

Abstract (en)

In a rotary printing press, the plate cylinder (12) is fitted to the carrier shaft (10) in a release mounting with a mechanism to fix its position in the peripheral and the axial directions, together with limit stops at the shaft. The limit stops have an axial adjustment at the collar (30) on the shaft, with openings (54) to be engaged by the positioning units (16) and contact the limit stops.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Rotationsdruckmaschine mit wenigstens einem Druckwerk, welches einen Plattenzylinder (12) aufweist, der lösbar auf der ihn tragenden Welle (10) anbringbar ist, wobei Plattenzylinder und Welle mit Mitteln versehen sind, die es ermöglichen, den Plattenzylinder sowohl axial als auch in Umfangsrichtung zur Welle und damit zum zu bedruckenden Objekt auszurichten und in der ausgerichteten Position an der Welle zu befestigten, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Plattenzylinder (12) mit Positioniermitteln (18) für die Festlegung seiner Position in Umfangsrichtung und in axialer Richtung versehen ist, die mit der Welle zugeordneten Anschlagmitteln zusammenwirken. Die Anschlagmittel sind axial verstellbar in einem von der Welle getragenen Kragen (30) angeordnet, der mit Ausnehmungen versehen ist, in die die Positioniermittel (16,18) eingreifen, um darin mit den Anschlägen in Berührung zu kommen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/20 (2006.01); B41F 13/16 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983846 A1 20000308; EP 0983846 B1 20030514; DE 19840310 A1 20000309; JP 2000085098 A 20000328; US 6308622 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070819

2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2007-03-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028970

2006-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905538 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI