Global Patent Index - EP 0983847 A1

EP 0983847 A1 2000-03-08 - Screen printing machine

Title (en)

Screen printing machine

Title (de)

Siebdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression sérigraphique

Publication

EP 0983847 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115234 A

Priority

DE 19838983 A

Abstract (en)

The screen printer has at least one screen printing template on a holder (24) carried by a screen carriage, moved reciprocally in the printing direction. There is a holder for the object to be printed onto that rotates during printing and a first drive mechanism for the screen carriage and object holder. A second drive mechanism between the first drive mechanism and the template enables adjustment of the template relative to the first drive in and against the direction of movement performed during printing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Siebdruckvorrichtung mit wenigstens einer Siebdruckschablone (10), die an einer Siebhalterung (24) angebracht ist, die von einem in Druckrichtung hin- und herbewegbaren Siebschlitten (30) getragen ist, und mit einer Halterung für das zu bedruckende Objekt, die während des Bedruckungsvorganges eine Rotationsbewegung erfährt, sowie einem ersten Antriebsmittel für den Siebschlitten (30) und die Objekthalterung, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß zwischen dem ersten Antriebsmittel, welches die Hin- und Herbewegung der Siebdruckschablone (10) während des Bedruckens bewirkt, und der Siebdruckschablone ein weiteres Antriebsmittel (40) angeordnet ist, durch welches die Siebdruckschablone relativ zum Siebschlitten einstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/08; B41F 15/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/08 (2006.01); B41F 15/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/36 (2013.01); B41F 15/0872 (2013.01); B41P 2215/112 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838983 A1 20000302; EP 0983847 A1 20000308; EP 0983847 B1 20021023

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2004-10-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903154 20021128

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI