Global Patent Index - EP 0983850 A3

EP 0983850 A3 2000-05-24 - Method for the influence on the transmission rate

Title (en)

Method for the influence on the transmission rate

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beeinflussung der Übertragungsrate

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'influence du taux de transmission

Publication

EP 0983850 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115131 A

Priority

DE 19840602 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0983850A2] To vary the flow rate of a transferred medium at a printing press, such as ink or varnish or water, a controlled speed is applied to vary the relative rotating surface speeds between the screen roller (5) or transfer roller between it and the applicator roller (7). The variation in the percentage surface speed ratio is 0.970-1.015. The variation can be in a positive or a negative direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/00; B41F 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2006.01); B41F 31/00 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/004 (2013.01); B41F 31/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983850 A2 20000308; EP 0983850 A3 20000524; EP 0983850 B1 20021030; DE 19840602 A1 20000309; JP 2000085108 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903233

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100810

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903233 20021205

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 31/00 A, 7B 41F 7/26 B

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI