Global patent index - EP 0983851 A2

EP 0983851 A2 2000-03-08 - Short fluid applying unit

Title (en)

Short fluid applying unit

Title (de)

Kurzauftragwerk

Title (fr)

Système court pour l'application d'une substance fluide

Publication

EP 0983851 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115132 A

Priority

DE 19840613 A

Abstract (en)

The applicator system to transfer ink or varnish or water to the forme cylinder of a printing press has a direct or indirect action, with at least one applicator roller (7) and a screen roller (5, 8, 10), working with a transfer roller (16). The screen roller (5, 8, 10) has a drive (12) with a variable speed. During normal working, the surface speed of the screen roller (5, 8, 10) differs from the speeds of the following rollers (7, 16) operating at the machine speed. To increase the flow rate of the transferred medium, the difference is reduced between the screen roller (5, 8, 10) surface speeds and the speeds of the following rollers (7,16).

Abstract (de)

Aufgabe der Erfindung ist die Schaffung eines Kurzauftragwerkes mit variabler Übertragungsmenge des Mediums. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, dass der Rasterwalze (5; 8; 10) ein drehzahlvariabler Antrieb (12) zugeordnet, im Normalbetrieb die Umfangsgeschwindigkeit der Rasterwalze (5; 8; 10) zur Umfangsgeschwindigkeit der nachgeordneten mit Maschinengeschwindigkeit rotierenden Walze (7; 16) unterschiedlich ist und zur Erhöhung der Menge des aufzutragenden Mediums die Umfangsgeschwindigkeitsdifferenz (vdiff) zwischen Rasterwalze (5; 8; 10) und der nachgeordneten Walze (7; 16) verringert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2006.01); B41F 31/00 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/00 (2013.01); B41F 31/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983851 A2 20000308; EP 0983851 A3 20000517; EP 0983851 B1 20021030; DE 19840613 A1 20000309; JP 2000085109 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status

2014-06-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59903234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120901

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100810

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-05

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI