Global Patent Index - EP 0983851 A3

EP 0983851 A3 2000-05-17 - Short fluid applying unit

Title (en)

Short fluid applying unit

Title (de)

Kurzauftragwerk

Title (fr)

Système court pour l'application d'une substance fluide

Publication

EP 0983851 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115132 A

Priority

DE 19840613 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0983851A2] The applicator system to transfer ink or varnish or water to the forme cylinder of a printing press has a direct or indirect action, with at least one applicator roller (7) and a screen roller (5, 8, 10), working with a transfer roller (16). The screen roller (5, 8, 10) has a drive (12) with a variable speed. During normal working, the surface speed of the screen roller (5, 8, 10) differs from the speeds of the following rollers (7, 16) operating at the machine speed. To increase the flow rate of the transferred medium, the difference is reduced between the screen roller (5, 8, 10) surface speeds and the speeds of the following rollers (7,16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2006.01); B41F 31/00 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/00 (2013.01); B41F 31/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983851 A2 20000308; EP 0983851 A3 20000517; EP 0983851 B1 20021030; DE 19840613 A1 20000309; JP 2000085109 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903234

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120901

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100810

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903234 20021205

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI