Global Patent Index - EP 0983853 A1

EP 0983853 A1 2000-03-08 - Automatic device for detecting misprints on, for example, metallized webs

Title (en)

Automatic device for detecting misprints on, for example, metallized webs

Title (de)

Automatische Einrichtung zum Nachweis von Druckfehlern zum Beispiel auf metallisiertes Bahnmaterial

Title (fr)

Dispositif automatique de détection de défauts d'impression par example sur des bandes métallisées

Publication

EP 0983853 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99116453 A

Priority

CH 178898 A

Abstract (en)

The device comprises a darkened housing (2) into which is fed the metallic strip (3) on rollers (4,5). The printed side of the strip is illuminated directly by flash lights (13,14) and indirectly a further flash lights (11,12) using a reflective diffusing surface (25). The objective lens of a video camera is located in a central opening in the diffuser to enable a section (7) of the strip to be examined. The objective lens is fitted with a semi-transparent filter (57) obliquely angled to reflect light received directly from the lower exterior lamp, which itself is fitted with a translucent diffuser. The lights and camera are located on a mounting assembly which can be moved within the housing to scan the full width of the strip. The camera is linked to a computer and monitor, to view and record reference and actual images, at pixel level, to detect print defects.

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif automatique (1) détecte les défauts d'impression apparaissant sur des bandes métallisées (3) ou sur tout autre support d'impression comprenant une prédominance de surfaces de couleurs spéculaires. Agencé dans un caisson (2) d'obscurcissement, ce dispositif comprend un bras (30) sur lequel peut se déplacer automatiquement un membre d'éclairage (10) muni d'une caméra vidéo (55). Cette caméra possède un objectif (56) à focale variable filmant en continu, au travers d'un filtre semi-transparent (57) placé dans une position oblique au devant de l'objectif, une portion de la bande (3) d'un format (7) de taille variable. L'éclairage de cette portion de bande est assuré par deux lampes-flash (12, 14) d'éclairage direct, principalement prévues pour l'illumination des surfaces non spéculaires de la bande, et par deux autres lampes-flash (11, 13) d'éclairage indirect, avantageusement prévues pour l'illumination des surfaces de couleurs spéculaires. L'une des deux lampes-flash (11, 13) comprend un diffuseur plan translucide (27) disposé sur sa face frontale avant et est préférentiellement orientée en direction du filtre semi-transparent (57), alors que l'autre lampe-flash (11) est orientée en direction de la surface d'un diffuseur concave et opaque (25). Englobant le filtre semi-transparent (57), ce diffuseur (25) est monté en son centre sur un manchon (26) qui réalise le lien mécanique et optique entre le diffuseur (25) et l'objectif (56) de la caméra (55). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/84 (2006.01); G01N 21/892 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983853 A1 20000308; EP 0983853 B1 20030502; CA 2280522 A1 20000302; CA 2280522 C 20030128; CH 692847 A5 20021129; DE 69907344 D1 20030605; DE 69907344 T2 20040325; ES 2199508 T3 20040216; JP 2000074843 A 20000314; JP 3203237 B2 20010827; US 6496219 B1 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070821

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070822

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070821

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070822

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070821

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060807

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060801

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060703

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199508 T3

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907344 P 20030605

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990821

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI