Global Patent Index - EP 0983855 A2

EP 0983855 A2 2000-03-08 - Dot substitution to compensate for failed ink jet nozzles

Title (en)

Dot substitution to compensate for failed ink jet nozzles

Title (de)

Ersatz von Punkten zur Kompensierung fehlender Tintenstrahldüsen

Title (fr)

Substitution de points pour la compensation des buses à jet d'encre défaillantes

Publication

EP 0983855 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306367 A

Priority

US 14457798 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet printer and a method of operating an ink jet printer wherein inoperative true black printing nozzles are detected, and substitute dots formed of non-black are printed at pixel locations that normally would be printed with the inoperative true black printing nozzles if such nozzles were operative. Each substitute dot comprises one or more constituent non-black dots, and in accordance with one implementation, each substituted dot comprises a composite or process black dot formed of two or three of cyan, magenta or yellow inks. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165; B41J 2/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/2103 (2013.01); B41J 2/2139 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983855 A2 20000308; EP 0983855 A3 20000802; JP 2000071432 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010203

2001-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI