Global Patent Index - EP 0983857 A1

EP 0983857 A1 2000-03-08 - Constant pressure ink reservoir for inkjet printer

Title (en)

Constant pressure ink reservoir for inkjet printer

Title (de)

Tintenbehälter mit kostantem Druck für Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Réservoir d'encre sous pression constante pour imprimante à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0983857 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202802 A

Priority

  • EP 99202802 A
  • EP 98202928 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for controlling pressure in an ink reservoir (16) of an ink jet printer, comprising a casing (26) and a piston (30) movable relative to the casing and defining therewith a variable-volume chamber (32) communicating with the ink reservoir, the piston being biased to maintain a pressure difference between the variable-volume chamber (32) and the outside, characterized in that the piston (30) is biased mainly by gravitational forces. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17556 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983857 A1 20000308; EP 0983857 B1 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160901

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937275 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI