Global Patent Index - EP 0983858 A1

EP 0983858 A1 2000-03-08 - A method of printing in a device for direct electrostatic printing comprising a printhead structure with deflection electrodes and a means for electrically controlling said deflection electrodes

Title (en)

A method of printing in a device for direct electrostatic printing comprising a printhead structure with deflection electrodes and a means for electrically controlling said deflection electrodes

Title (de)

Druckverfahren und Steuerung für Druckkopf mit Ablenkelektroden zum direkten elektrostatischen Drucken

Title (fr)

Méthode d'impression et contrôle pour une tête d'impression avec système d'électrodes de déviation pour l'impression électrostatique directe

Publication

EP 0983858 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99200478 A

Priority

  • EP 99200478 A
  • EP 98201965 A

Abstract (en)

A printhead structure (106) for use in a device for direct electrostatic printing with an addressability AD in dots per cm, is provided comprising a sheet of insulating material (106c) having a first and a second face, at least one row of printing elements (116) on said substrate, each of said printing elements including at least one printing aperture (107) through said insulating substrate. The printhead structure further comprises at least one set of deflection electrodes arranged in said printhead structure so as to have at most one deflection electrode near two adjacent printing elements. The deflection electrodes are coupled to a voltage source for applying to each set of deflection electrodes a varying voltage. Preferably the number of printing elements per cm, in the row of printing elements, is equal to the addressability, AD, and the varying voltage has a frequency, f, correlated to the line time of the printing LT, so that f x LT 1.00.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/415

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/415 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/4155 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983858 A1 20000308; EP 0983858 B1 20010606

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-05-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900137 20010712

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2001-06-06 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-06-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-06-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-03-15 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI