Global Patent Index - EP 0983870 A1

EP 0983870 A1 2000-03-08 - Sharpener for soft pencil leads

Title (en)

Sharpener for soft pencil leads

Title (de)

Spitzer, insbesondere für Weichminenstifte

Title (fr)

Taille-crayon pour crayons à mine tendre

Publication

EP 0983870 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113496 A

Priority

DE 19840309 A

Abstract (en)

The sharpener has an accommodation channel (5) for the useful end of the pencil (6) in a housing (2) and a blade-like shaping device (8). The housing sits on the shaft of the marker pencil as a protective cap whilst the pencil is not in use. The clamp connecting device is an external clamping force generator (21,28) that can be manually removed from housing engagement.

Abstract (de)

Ein Spitzer (1) enthält ein Gehäuse (2) mit einem Aufnahmekanal (5) für den bei Bedarf zu spitzenden Stift (6). Der Spitzer (1) soll für die Dauer der Nichtbenutzung des Stiftes (6) als Schutzkappe spannschlüssig auf dem Stiftumfang aufsitzen. Das dazu erforderliche Spannverbindungsmittel ist ein aus einer Gehäusebeaufschlagung manuell entfernbarer externer Spannkrafterzeuger, insbesondere ein Reinigungsstäbchen (20,20'; 21,21'), mit zur Spannkrafterzeugung z. B. eine Drucknocke in Form eines Keils (26,26a) oder einem Exzenter (28,28'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43L 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983870 A1 20000308; EP 0983870 B1 20011107; DE 19840309 A1 20000309; US 6286218 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900399

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090810

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080713

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080713

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080713

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-07-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050713

2004-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900399 20011213

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IE IT

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI