Global Patent Index - EP 0983921 A1

EP 0983921 A1 2000-03-08 - Improvements to vehicle-transporting railway cars

Title (en)

Improvements to vehicle-transporting railway cars

Title (de)

Verbesserungen an Eisenbahnwagen für den Transport von Fahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Perfectionnements aux wagons ferroviaires pour le transport des véhicules

Publication

EP 0983921 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99116759 A

Priority

US 14550398 A

Abstract (en)

Improvements to vehicle-transporting railway cars comprising movable bridge plate supports which avoid interference with door clearance requirements, and improved end door lock, and a flexible deflector for decreasing air flow about the outer edges of the end doors. The movable bridge plate supports comprise a lower deck bridge plate support which is movable between a retractable position in which it can support the free end of the bridge plate connected to an adjacent car, and an extended position in which it may be pivotally connected to a bridge plate while spanning a door track. An upper deck bridge plate is provided which comprises a movable member and fixed member, with the movable member and fixed member in combination engaging opposite sides of one of a bridge plate for pivotal connection thereto. Each of the lower deck bridge plates includes a support member for engaging the free end of a bridge plate connected to an adjacent car, and includes a foot to support provided by the door track when in extended position. The improved lock includes lubrication conduits extending between external surfaces and lock pin apertures in top and bottom walls which are joined by a channel shaped side wall structure, and further includes circumferentional channels within the interior surfaces of the lock pin apertures to, dispose between pin engaging surfaces therein, for distribution of lubricant. The flexible deflector extends inward from each of the side walls where the outer edges of the end doors to decrease or inhibit air flow around the outer edges without contacting the end doors when in closed position. The bridge plate supports, lock, and deflectors all must be sufficiently strong and durable to withstand loads imposed during railway service over extended periods of years, without failure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 3/18; B61D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/18 (2006.01); B61D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/187 (2013.01); B61D 3/18 (2013.01); B61D 19/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983921 A1 20000308; AU 4588499 A 20000316; CA 2246885 A1 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000718;LT PAYMENT 20000718;LV PAYMENT 20000718;MK PAYMENT 20000718;RO PAYMENT 20000718;SI PAYMENT 20000718

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLACK, JAMES E., JR.

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBERTSON, JAMES C.

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIMPSON, JAMES M.

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI