Global Patent Index - EP 0983946 A2

EP 0983946 A2 2000-03-08 - Container carrier

Title (en)

Container carrier

Title (de)

Behälterträger

Title (fr)

Porte-récipients

Publication

EP 0983946 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116449 A

Priority

DE 29815677 U

Abstract (en)

In the cover wall (4) are two spaced apart engagement apertures (7,8). A connection between one of the walls (2) and an adhesive tab (6) on an adjacent wall or between overlapping sections of one of these walls is available. Above the container group is a further section of foldable surface material, particularly of cardboard, which involves a reinforcement wall under the cover wall. Two spaced apart engagement apertures in the reinforcement wall between those in the cover wall are provided. A connection is provided with the section (1) encasing the container.

Abstract (de)

Behälterträger mit einem Zuschnitt (1) faltbaren Flachmaterials, insbesondere aus Karton, zum Umhüllen einer Gruppe Flaschen oder anderer Behälter, der, eine Bodenwand (2), an die Längsseiten der Bodenwand gelenkte Seitenwände (3,5), eine an weitere Längsseiten der Seitenwände gelenkte Deckwand (4), zwei voneinander beabstandete Eingriffsöffnungen (7,8) in der Deckwand und eine Verbindung zwischen einer der vorgenannten Wände und einer an einer benachbarten Wand angelenkten Klebelasche (6) oder zwischen überlappenden Abschnitten einer dieser Wände aufweist und mit einem oberhalb der Gruppe Behälter anzuordnenden weiteren Zuschnitt (23) faltbaren Flachmaterials, insbesondere aus Karton, der, eine unter der Deckwand angeordnete Verstärkungswand (24), zwei voneinander beabstandete und unterhalb der Eingriffsöffnungen (28,29) der Deckwand angeordnete weitere Eingriffsöffnungen in der Verstärkungswand und eine Verbindung mit dem die Behälter umhüllenden Zuschnitt aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/36 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00141 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00469 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0053 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00549 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00574 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00728 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815677 U1 19981119; DK 0983946 T3 20030512; EP 0983946 A2 20000308; EP 0983946 A3 20000315; EP 0983946 B1 20030115; US 6170741 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL EUROPE NETHERL, NL

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-05-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL EUROPE NETHERL, NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: A&R CARTON BV, SNEEK, NL

- Document: DE 59904028

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904028

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904028

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENTANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-04-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904028

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2011-09-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-08-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110707 AND 20110713

2011-06-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL EUROPE NETHERL, NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: A & R CARTON BREMEN GMBH, 28309 BREMEN, DE

- Document: DE 59904028

- Effective date: 20110408

2007-08-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-06-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-05-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904028 P 20030220

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SKOLIK, BERNARD

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ECKERMANN, JENS

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHEELCKE, HILGER

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: A&R CARTON GMBH

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010712

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI