Global Patent Index - EP 0983962 A1

EP 0983962 A1 2000-03-08 - Beverage dispenser with control of the presence of beverage holding container

Title (en)

Beverage dispenser with control of the presence of beverage holding container

Title (de)

Getränke-Abgabevorrichtung mit Anzeige des Vorhandenseins des Vorratsbehälters

Title (fr)

Appareil de distribution de boissons avec contrôle de l' installation du récipient d'alimentation

Publication

EP 0983962 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402184 A

Priority

FR 9811096 A

Abstract (en)

The device comprises levers (13,13') engaging the upturned storage container (5) and the support (9) for the nozzle (7) delivering the fluid to the dispensing element. The levers are spring-loaded (16,16') so that, without load, contact is made by elements (17,17') with the base (15). On removal of the container or the support electrical signals are fed to the electronic circuit (20) to power lights (18,19) on the front of the dispenser. The circuit includes a timing device to determine duration between removal of container and nozzle.

Abstract (fr)

L'appareil de distribution de boissons 1 comporte une installation de contrôle permettant de gérer l'approvisionnement en récipients 5 de boisson ainsi que l'entretien et le nettoyage de certaines parties de l'appareil (support 9 de l'embout 7 etc.). Cette installation comprend des détecteurs 13 à 17 de la présence du récipient 5 et 13' à 17' de la présence du support 9, reliés à un système de signalisation ou d'alarme 18, 19 par l'intermédiaire d'une carte électronique 20 à horloges ou compteurs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 3/00; B67D 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/07 (2006.01); B67D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/0029 (2013.01); B67D 1/07 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 9712128 A 19970930

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983962 A1 20000308; EP 0983962 B1 20011205; AT 210070 T 20011215; DE 69900532 D1 20020117; DE 69900532 T2 20020801; DK 0983962 T3 20020402; ES 2169590 T3 20020701; FR 2782994 A1 20000310; FR 2782994 B1 20001215; PT 983962 E 20020531

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170914

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140303

2014-03-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140303

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69900532

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-04-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120305

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120925

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-20 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-06-20 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120613

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-05-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2009-04-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090312 AND 20090318

2008-11-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR2 AVENUE AMBROISE CROIZAT, FR-

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-11-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR2 AVENUE AMBROISE CROIZAT, FR-

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-11-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-07-14 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-07-08 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NESTLE WATERS POWWOW FRANCE, FR

- Effective date: 20080624

2008-07-08 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: NESTLE WATERS DIRECT FRANCE, FR

- Effective date: 20080624

2007-09-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-01 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-12-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-04-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169590 T3

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900532 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210070 T 20011215

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI