Global Patent Index - EP 0983984 A3

EP 0983984 A3 2000-05-17 - Method for reductive cleavage of linear and cyclic acetals, especially formals

Title (en)

Method for reductive cleavage of linear and cyclic acetals, especially formals

Title (de)

Verfahren zur reduzierenden Spaltung von linearen und cyclischen Acetalen, insbesondere Formalen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la scission réductive d'acétals linéaires et cycliques, notamment de formals

Publication

EP 0983984 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116581 A

Priority

DE 19840276 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0983984A2] A reaction temperature of 200-300 degrees C, with a weight ratio of (catalyst metal):(acetal) = less than 0.1 (for suspension methods) is used in the reductive cleavage of linear and cyclic acetals, especially formals, in aqueous, formate-containing media in presence of a heterogeneous hydrogenation catalyst and hydrogen at 0.1-30 MPa and pH below 7.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 29/90; C07C 29/132; C07C 31/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/46 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 29/132 (2006.01); C07C 29/90 (2006.01); C07C 31/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 29/132 (2013.01); C07C 29/90 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 29/132 + C07C 31/245
  2. C07C 29/90 + C07C 31/245

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0983984 A2 20000308; EP 0983984 A3 20000517; BR 9904064 A 20000919; CA 2281364 A1 20000304; DE 19840276 A1 20000309; DE 19840276 C2 20021031; JP 2000086551 A 20000328; TW 460443 B 20011021; US 6265623 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020915

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PERSTORP SPECIALTY CHEMICALS AB

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT SE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990825

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI