Global Patent Index - EP 0984057 A1

EP 0984057 A1 2000-03-08 - The use of an aliphatic-aromatic diacyl peroxide in a bleaching composition

Title (en)

The use of an aliphatic-aromatic diacyl peroxide in a bleaching composition

Title (de)

Verwendung von aliphatisch-aromatischen Diacylperoxiden in Bleichmittelszusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'aliphatique-aromatique diacyl peroxide dans un composition de blanchiment

Publication

EP 0984057 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98870184 A

Priority

EP 98870184 A

Abstract (en)

The use of an aliphatic-aromatic diacyl peroxide in a bleaching composition to provide stain removal and improved fabric colour safety.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/38 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 7/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3945 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984057 A1 20000308; CA 2340399 A1 20000309; JP 2002523613 A 20020730; WO 0012666 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041214

2004-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040803

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI