Global patent index - EP 0984059 A1

EP 0984059 A1 2000-03-08 - Bleaching compositions

Title (en)

Bleaching compositions

Title (de)

Bleichmittelszusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions de blanchiment

Publication

EP 0984059 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98870185 A

Priority

EP 98870185 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to liquid hypohalite bleach-containing compositions which comprise an alkyl ethoxy sulphate having a low number of moles of ethoxy groups.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/395; C11D 1/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3956 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984059 A1 20000308; CA 2340253 A1 20000309; WO 0012668 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030217

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI