Global patent index - EP 0984071 A1

EP 0984071 A1 2000-03-08 - Use of copper alloys for cooled press plates

Title (en)

Use of copper alloys for cooled press plates

Title (de)

Verwendung von Kupferlegierungen für Kühlpressplatten

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'alliages de cuivre pour des plaques de pression refroidies

Publication

EP 0984071 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115307 A

Priority

DE 19840094 A

Abstract (en)

The use of copper alloys, having a specified hardness and thermal conductivity, for press cooling plates in roller hearth steel heat treatment furnaces, is new. Copper alloys, having a Brinell hardness of 150-350 (preferably 230-280, especially 250) N/mm<2> HB10 at 20 degrees C and a thermal conductivity of 100-250 (preferably 220) W/m.K at 500 degrees C, are used for press cooling plates in a roller hearth steel heat treatment furnace having a cooling zone for cooling the steel parts with a desired cooling characteristic.

Abstract (de)

Anwendung von Kupferlegierungen für Kühlpreßplatten in Rollenofen-Einrichtungen für die Wärmebehandlung von Stahlteilen. In der Kühlzone werden die Stahlteile mit der gewünschten Abkühlungscharakteristik und Wärmeleitfähigkeiten (in W/m·K bei 500°C) von 100 bis 250 abgekühlt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/673; C22C 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/673 (2006.01); C22C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/673 (2013.01); C22C 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 2003306 A1 19700730 - TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK, et al
  • [A] DE 4427939 A1 19960208 - KABELMETAL AG [DE]
  • [A] EP 0305986 A2 19890308 - MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]
  • [A] EP 0753587 A1 19970115 - HEIMSOTH VERWALTUNGEN [DE]
  • [AD] J. WÜNNING: "DIE WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG IN DER FERTIGUNGSLINIE MIT EINEM NEUARTIGEN ROLLENHERDOFEN*", HÄRTEREI TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN, MÜNCHEN, DE, vol. 45, no. 6, December 1990 (1990-12-01), pages 325 - 329, XP000163038, ISSN: 0341-101X
  • [A] HELMUT LÜPFERT: "METALLISCHE WERKSTOFFE", C. F. WINTER'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG, PRIEN, DE, 9. AUFLAGE, 1966, XP002116141

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984071 A1 20000308; DE 19840094 A1 20000316; DE 19840094 C2 20020919

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020213

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI