Global Patent Index - EP 0984084 A2

EP 0984084 A2 2000-03-08 - Process for manufacturing cellulosic fibres

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing cellulosic fibres

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cellulosefasern

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de fibres de cellulose

Publication

EP 0984084 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123392 A

Priority

  • DE 4431635 A
  • EP 95931179 A

Abstract (en)

Prodn. of soln. of spun cellulose fibre with reduced fibrillation tendency is by treatment of the fibres with (A) a N-methylol ether of a carboxamide, urethane, urea or aminotriazine; (B) a cyclic hydroxy or alkoxy ethylene urea N-substd. by 1 or more alkyl gps.; (C) a hydrophilic modified polyisocyanate; and/or (D) a polyurethane/isocyanate mixt..

Abstract (de)

Herstellung von aus Lösungsmitteln gesponnenen Cellulosefasern mit verringerter Neigung zum Fibrillieren, indem man die Fasern mit einer oder mehreren Verbindungen aus der Gruppe der (A) N-Methylolether von Carbonsäureamiden, Urethanen, Harnstoffen und Aminotriazinen, (B) durch eine oder mehrere Alkylgruppen N-substituierten cyclischen Hydroxy- oder Alkoxyethylenharnstoffe, (C) hydrophil modifizierten Polyisocyanate und (D) Mischungen von Polyurethanen mit Isocyanaten behandelt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 2/00; D01F 11/02; D06M 15/423; D06M 15/564

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/00 (2006.01); D01F 11/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/358 (2006.01); D06M 13/395 (2006.01); D06M 13/419 (2006.01); D06M 13/432 (2006.01); D06M 15/423 (2006.01); D06M 15/564 (2006.01); D06M 15/568 (2006.01); D06M 15/572 (2006.01); D06M 101/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 11/02 (2013.01); D01F 2/00 (2013.01); D06M 13/358 (2013.01); D06M 13/395 (2013.01); D06M 13/419 (2013.01); D06M 13/432 (2013.01); D06M 15/423 (2013.01); D06M 15/564 (2013.01); D06M 15/568 (2013.01); D06M 15/572 (2013.01); D06M 2101/06 (2013.01); D06M 2200/35 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5776394 A 19980707; AT 194018 T 20000715; AT 226985 T 20021115; AT 230447 T 20030115; DE 4431635 A1 19960307; DK 0779942 T3 20000828; EP 0779942 A1 19970625; EP 0779942 B1 20000621; EP 0984084 A2 20000308; EP 0984084 A3 20000419; EP 0984084 B1 20030102; EP 0985747 A2 20000315; EP 0985747 A3 20000419; EP 0985747 B1 20021030; ES 2148552 T3 20001016; ES 2190169 T3 20030716; JP H10505389 A 19980526; WO 9607780 A1 19960314

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BASF A.G.

- Effective date: 20050831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060822

2007-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060822

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050823

2006-08-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060822

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-08-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-08-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050811

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050803

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-09-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190169 T3

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-04-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510523 P 20030206

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102:NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 779942

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230447 T 20030115

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01F 2/00 A, 7D 01F 11/02 B, 7D 06M 15/564 B, 7D 06M 101:06 Z

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020327

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-03-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 779942

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE