Global patent index - EP 0984084 A3

EP 0984084 A3 2000-04-19 - Process for manufacturing cellulosic fibres

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing cellulosic fibres

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cellulosefasern

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de fibres de cellulose

Publication

EP 0984084 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123392 A

Priority

  • DE 4431635 A
  • EP 95931179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5776394A] PCT No. PCT/EP95/03327 Sec. 371 Date Mar. 6, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Mar. 6, 1997 PCT Filed Aug. 22, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/07780 PCT Pub. Date Mar. 14, 1996Solvent-spun cellulose fibers having a reduced tendency to fibrillate are produced by treating the fibers with one or more compounds from the group of the (A) N-methylol ethers of carboxamides, urethanes, ureas and aminotriazines, (B) N-alkyl-mono- or polysubstituted cyclic hydroxy- or alkoxy-ethyleneureas, (C) hydrophilic modified polyisocyanates, and (D) mixtures of polyurethanes with isocyanates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 2/00; D01F 11/02; D06M 15/423; D06M 15/564

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/00 (2006.01); D01F 11/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/358 (2006.01); D06M 13/395 (2006.01); D06M 13/419 (2006.01); D06M 13/432 (2006.01); D06M 15/423 (2006.01); D06M 15/564 (2006.01); D06M 15/568 (2006.01); D06M 15/572 (2006.01); D06M 101/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 11/02 (2013.01); D01F 2/00 (2013.01); D06M 13/358 (2013.01); D06M 13/395 (2013.01); D06M 13/419 (2013.01); D06M 13/432 (2013.01); D06M 15/423 (2013.01); D06M 15/564 (2013.01); D06M 15/568 (2013.01); D06M 15/572 (2013.01); D06M 2101/06 (2013.01); D06M 2200/35 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5776394 A 19980707; AT 194018 T 20000715; AT 226985 T 20021115; AT 230447 T 20030115; DE 4431635 A1 19960307; DK 0779942 T3 20000828; EP 0779942 A1 19970625; EP 0779942 B1 20000621; EP 0984084 A2 20000308; EP 0984084 A3 20000419; EP 0984084 B1 20030102; EP 0985747 A2 20000315; EP 0985747 A3 20000419; EP 0985747 B1 20021030; ES 2148552 T3 20001016; ES 2190169 T3 20030716; JP H10505389 A 19980526; WO 9607780 A1 19960314

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BASF A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060822

2007-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060822

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050823

2006-08-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060822

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-08-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-08-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050811

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050803

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-09-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2190169

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-04-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59510523

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: 20030102:NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 779942

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 230447

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 01F 2/00 A, 7D 01F 11/02 B, 7D 06M 15/564 B, 7D 06M 101:06 Z

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020327

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-03-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 779942

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE