Global patent index - EP 0984088 A2

EP 0984088 A2 2000-03-08 - Adjusting apparatus on a carding machine

Title (en)

Adjusting apparatus on a carding machine

Title (de)

Einstellvorrichtung an einer Karde

Title (fr)

Appareil de réglage dans une machine de cardage

Publication

EP 0984088 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122548 A

Priority

  • CH 37996 A
  • CH 45296 A
  • EP 97810074 A

Abstract (en)

A flow guide (4A) is placed in the emergent gap (S) between the card cylinder (104) and doffer (107). It is rounded (54) at its leading edge (50) and has a waisted center section (75) with a concave outer surface (76) that blends in smoothly with the base section (78). The guide (4A) is supported in such a way that the gap (E) can be adjusted from outside without dismantling.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einstellvorrichtung zur Beeinflussung der Luftstromverhältnisse im Bereich Tambour/Abnehmer einer Karde. Die Vorrichtung ist am Trommelschild 113 angeordnet und umfasst Einstellmittel 32,12 bzw. 12A. Die an dem vorgespannten Segment 14 angeordnete Zunge 12,12A wird mittels der Einstellschraube 32 gegenüber der Trommelgarnitur auf die gewünschte Distanz A eingestellt. Ferner ist auch der Zugang zu der Befestigungsschraube 34 der Zunge durch den Trommelschild gestattet, so dass die Einstellung der Zunge und ihre Montage vereinfacht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/28 (2006.01); D01G 15/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/46 (2013.01); D01G 15/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790338 A2 19970820; EP 0790338 A3 19971029; EP 0790338 B1 20021016; DE 59708290 D1 20021024; DE 59708464 D1 20021121; EP 0984088 A2 20000308; EP 0984088 A3 20000405; EP 0984088 B1 20020918

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050212

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030128

2003-02-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030204

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59708290

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 790338

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011127

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 790338

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI