Global Patent Index - EP 0984088 A3

EP 0984088 A3 2000-04-05 - Adjusting apparatus on a carding machine

Title (en)

Adjusting apparatus on a carding machine

Title (de)

Einstellvorrichtung an einer Karde

Title (fr)

Appareil de réglage dans une machine de cardage

Publication

EP 0984088 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122548 A

Priority

  • CH 37996 A
  • CH 45296 A
  • EP 97810074 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790338A2] The adjustment system at a card, to set the air flow ratios at the drum/doffer zone, has a setting mechanism (32,12A) passing through the drum shield (113). Also claimed is a card.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/28 (2006.01); D01G 15/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/46 (2013.01); D01G 15/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790338 A2 19970820; EP 0790338 A3 19971029; EP 0790338 B1 20021016; DE 59708290 D1 20021024; DE 59708464 D1 20021121; EP 0984088 A2 20000308; EP 0984088 A3 20000405; EP 0984088 B1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050212

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030128

2003-02-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030204

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708290 20021024

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 790338

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011127

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 790338

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI