Global Patent Index - EP 0984089 A1

EP 0984089 A1 2000-03-08 - Method and device for weft insertion in a gripper loom

Title (en)

Method and device for weft insertion in a gripper loom

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zum Eintragen eines Schussfadens in einer Greiferwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'insertion d'un fil de trame dans un métier à tisser à griffes

Publication

EP 0984089 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810618 A

Priority

  • EP 99810618 A
  • EP 98810869 A

Abstract (en)

A reciprocating weft inserter for a gripper loom has a yarn clip that can be adjusted for a clamping force and a gripping width between weaving cycles. The weft yarn on a gripper loom is supplied through a tensioner and selector to a clip (4) on the weft inserter (1). The clamping force can be adjusted by a mechanism (11) which moves the support position (17) of a leaf spring (9). The width of the clamping region between the jaws (6,7) of the clip (4) is adjusted by a mechanism (21) with a slide (22) driven by a motor (23).

Abstract (de)

Bei dem Verfahren wird ein über eine Fadenbremse und einen Fadenvorleger zugeführter Schussfaden mittels Greifer mit Fadenklemme in ein Webfach eingetragen, wobei während des Vorganges der Eintragung des Schussfadens die Fadenklemme für jeden Schusseintrag frei wählbar eingestellt wird. Damit wird erreicht, dass Schussgarne unterschiedlicher Ausführung und Dicke in ein Webfach eingetragen werden können. Das System umfasst einen Greifer (1) mit Fadenklemme (4) und eine Anordnung (4) mit einer ersten Vorrichtung (11) zum Einstellen der Fadenklemme und mit einer zweiten Vorrichtung (21) zum Betätigen der ersten Vorrichtung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/20; D03D 47/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/20 (2006.01); D03D 47/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/236 (2013.01); D03D 47/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984089 A1 20000308; EP 0984089 B1 20031210

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100712

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59908000

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULTEX A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090818

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908000

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULTEX AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020524

2000-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI