Global Patent Index - EP 0984093 A1

EP 0984093 A1 2000-03-08 - Flood preventing device with tiltable magnet

Title (en)

Flood preventing device with tiltable magnet

Title (de)

Überflutungssicherung mit drehbaren Magneten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection contre les inondations avec aimant basculable

Publication

EP 0984093 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115505 A

Priority

DE 19840022 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840022C1] Holder (21) can be transferred, through supply of leaked water, into a position in which second magnet (20) is released rotationally. Retaining device (31) supports the second magnet (20) across the shifting direction of the valve body (14), when the holder is transferred from its first position into its second position in order to create a relative movement between holder (21) and magnet (20). Mechanism to prevent over flooding in washing machines in which a valve (2) features a water passage (7) between a tap and the water supply pipe (8), and a valve body (14) located shiftably in the water passage. The valve body (14) is connected to a first magnet (16) and controlled by an operating device (3) with a second magnet (20) and a movable holder (21), which holds the second magnet (20) in one of its positions. The holder (21) can be transferred, through the supply of leaked water, into a position in which the second magnet (20) is released rotationally. A retaining device (31) is provided to support the second magnet across the shifting direction of the valve body (14) when the holder is transferred from its first position into its second position in order to create a relative movement between the holder (21) and the second magnet (20).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Überflutungssicherung für Waschmaschinen, mit einem Wasserzulaufrohr, einem zweiten Rohr, welches das Wasserzulaufrohr unter Bildung eines Hohlraumes umgibt, einem Ventil, das einen Wasserdurchgang zwischen einem Wasserhahn und dem Wasserzulaufrohr und einen Ventilkörper aufweist, der zum Verschließen des Ventils in Strömungsrichtung und zum Öffnen des Ventils entgegen der Strömungsrichtung verschieblich im Wasserdurchgang angeordnet und mit einem ersten Magneten verbunden ist, mit einer Betätigungseinrichtung zum Steuern des Ventilkörpers, die einen zweiten, gegenüber dem ersten Magneten entgegengesetzt gepolten, beweglich gelagerten Magneten und einen beweglichen Halter aufweist, der in einer ersten Stellung den zweiten Magneten hält, so daß der zweite Magnet bei geöffnetem Ventil mit dem ersten Magneten fluchtet und den Ventilkörper über den ersten Magneten entgegen der Strömungsrichtung vorspannt, wobei die Betätigungseinrichtung zum Bewegen des Halters ein mit über den Hohlraum zugeführtem Leckwasser reagierendes Element aufweist. Um die Betriebssicherheit derartiger Überflutungssicherung zu erhöhen, und um den Platzbedarf zu verringern, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß der Halter durch das Zuführen von Leckwasser in eine zweite Stellung überführbar ist, in welcher der zweite Magnet drehbar freigegeben ist und daß eine Rückhaltevorrichtung vorgesehen ist, in der sich der zweite Magnet beim Überführen des Halters von der ersten in die zweite Stellung zum Erzeugen einer Relativbewegung zwischen dem Halter und dem zweiten Magneten quer zur Verschieberichtung des Ventilkörpers abstützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840022 C1 19991223; EP 0984093 A1 20000308; EP 0984093 B1 20021120; ES 2186282 T3 20030501

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186282 T3

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903450 20030102

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI