Global Patent Index - EP 0984093 B1

EP 0984093 B1 2002-11-20 - Flood preventing device with tiltable magnet

Title (en)

Flood preventing device with tiltable magnet

Title (de)

Überflutungssicherung mit drehbaren Magneten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection contre les inondations avec aimant basculable

Publication

EP 0984093 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115505 A

Priority

DE 19840022 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840022C1] Holder (21) can be transferred, through supply of leaked water, into a position in which second magnet (20) is released rotationally. Retaining device (31) supports the second magnet (20) across the shifting direction of the valve body (14), when the holder is transferred from its first position into its second position in order to create a relative movement between holder (21) and magnet (20). Mechanism to prevent over flooding in washing machines in which a valve (2) features a water passage (7) between a tap and the water supply pipe (8), and a valve body (14) located shiftably in the water passage. The valve body (14) is connected to a first magnet (16) and controlled by an operating device (3) with a second magnet (20) and a movable holder (21), which holds the second magnet (20) in one of its positions. The holder (21) can be transferred, through the supply of leaked water, into a position in which the second magnet (20) is released rotationally. A retaining device (31) is provided to support the second magnet across the shifting direction of the valve body (14) when the holder is transferred from its first position into its second position in order to create a relative movement between the holder (21) and the second magnet (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840022 C1 19991223; EP 0984093 A1 20000308; EP 0984093 B1 20021120; ES 2186282 T3 20030501

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170912

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186282 T3

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903450 20030102

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI