Global Patent Index - EP 0984109 A3

EP 0984109 A3 2001-04-11 - Building block and method and apparatus for making same

Title (en)

Building block and method and apparatus for making same

Title (de)

Baustein sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Bloc de construction et procédé et appareil de fabrication

Publication

EP 0984109 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116998 A

Priority

  • DE 19850692 A
  • DE 19840335 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0984109A2] A building block is made by extruding clay through a die with variable apertures. The interior of the block has hollow spaces (13,14) running through the length of the block. Some of the ribs forming the spaces are broken up by periodically closing off the respective apertures of the die and some of the spaces have a large width to depth ratio at right angles to the expected thermal flow when built into a wall. Another variation is to perforate some of the ribs. The overall effect is to retain the strength and sound damping properties while reducing the thermal losses through the block. The wider spaces have a width to depth ratio of up to 5 to 1 depending on the thickness of the ribs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/14; B28B 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/26 (2006.01); E04B 2/14 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/26 (2013.01); E04B 2/14 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0208 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0226 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984109 A2 20000308; EP 0984109 A3 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011012

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 2/14 A, 7B 28B 3/26 B

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI