Global patent index - EP 0984110 A2

EP 0984110 A2 2000-03-08 - Building block of siliceous materials

Title (en)

Building block of siliceous materials

Title (de)

Baustein aus silikatischen Rohstoffen

Title (fr)

Bloc de construction en matériau siliceux

Publication

EP 0984110 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890274 A

Priority

AT 150898 A

Abstract (en)

A silicate block (1), comprises a heat insulating porous silicate material with a cavity filling (6, 7, 8, 9) and/or exterior coating (10, 11) of high strength dense silicate material. A silicate construction block (1), having vertical through-cavities (2-5), consists of a highly thermally insulating loose porous silicate material of low apparent density having a (partial) cavity filling (6, 7, 8, 9) and/or an exterior coating (10, 11) of dense solid silicate material of high apparent density and high compressive strength.

Abstract (de)

Ein Baustein (1), wie etwa ein Lochziegel, weist eine strukturbildende Raumform aus lockerem porösem Silikatmaterial geringer Rohdichte und hoher thermischer Isolierung (Wärmedämmung), z.B. Lehm oder Ton gemischt mit Porosierungsmitteln in einer Rohdichte kleiner als 1500 kg/m<3> auf. Die Füllung bzw. teilweise Füllung wenigstens einiger der Hohlräume (2, 3, 4, 5) des Bausteines (1) oder die Beschichtung, insbesondere einer oder mehrerer der Aussenseiten, besteht aus dichtem, festem Silikatmaterial hoher Rohdichte und hoher Druckfestigkeit, z.B. Lehm oder Ton getrocknet und gebrannt mit einer Rohdichte von mehr als 1500 kg/m<3>. Die Füllung oder Beschichtung erstreckt sich über die gesamte Höhe des Bausteins. Die Füllung kann auch nachträglich eingesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/18; E04C 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/18 (2006.01); E04C 1/40 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/40 (2013.01); E04B 2/18 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0208 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0228 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0286 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0293 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984110 A2 20000308; EP 0984110 A3 20010912; AT 407171 B 20010125; AT A150898 A 20000515; HU 9902939 A2 20010528; HU 9902939 A3 20020128; HU 9902939 D0 19991129; PL 335224 A1 20000313

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 2/18 A, 7E 04C 1/40 B, 7E 04C 1/41 B, 7E 04B 2/14 B

2000-06-09 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI