Global Patent Index - EP 0984113 A1

EP 0984113 A1 2000-03-08 - Roofing tiles adapter

Title (en)

Roofing tiles adapter

Title (de)

Dachpfannenadapter

Title (fr)

Adaptateur pour tuiles de toiture

Publication

EP 0984113 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116728 A

Priority

DE 19839475 A

Abstract (en)

An adapter (16) for a roof hatch (11) has a shaped support plate which fits into the roof structure to provide a sealed fitting. The plate carries a support onto which can be fitted a variety of fittings, e.g. a ventilation flap, an access hatch, venting pipes etc. To change the function of the hatch only the top fittings need to be replaced. The roof fitting remains in place.

Abstract (de)

Dachpfannenadapter (16) einer Dachpfanne (10), in der eine zur Ausbildung einer Dachdurchführung geeignete Durchtrittsöffnung (11) ausgebildet ist, wobei der ; Dachpfannenadapter (16) in die Durchtrittsöffnung (11) einsetzbar ist, an dem die Durchtrittsöffnung (11) umgebenden Pfannenrand lösbar befestigbar ist und Mittel zur Anbringung unterschiedlicher Elemente (18) der Dachdurchführung und/oder Dachentlüftung an dem Dachpfannenadapter (16) aufweist. Unterschiedliche Elemente der Dachdurchführung und/oder Dachentlüftung können an einer Dachpfanne angebracht werden, an der eine Durchtrittsöffnung (11) ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/147; E04D 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/30 (2006.01); E04D 13/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1476 (2013.01); E04D 1/30 (2013.01); E04D 13/1471 (2013.01); E04D 2001/307 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984113 A1 20000308; DE 19839475 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI