Global Patent Index - EP 0984125 A1

EP 0984125 A1 2000-03-08 - Locking device for traction cable actuated gates

Title (en)

Locking device for traction cable actuated gates

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung für zugseilbetätigte Tore

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour portes actionnées par cable de traction

Publication

EP 0984125 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112773 A

Priority

DE 19839630 A

Abstract (en)

The locking mechanism comprises a blocking element (16) in the form of an angle-piece or bolt fixed to a frame (12) or to a guide rail (14). A locking element (26) is fixed to the door (10). A control (24) locks and unlocks the blocking and locking elements in relation to the tension of the pull-cable (28). The locking element is fixed to the control which is swivel mounted on the door. The control consists of at least one spring (22a,b) which engages with the blocking element when the tension of the pull-cable is released.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Verriegelungsvorrichtung für den Einsatz in zugseilbetätigten Toren, beispielsweise in Sektionaltoren oder Schwenktoren. Eine erfindungsgemäße Verriegelungsvorrichtung umfaßt dabei ein mit einem Rahmen (12) oder einer Führungsschiene (14) fest verbundenes Sperrelement (16), sowie ein an dem Tor (10) befestigtes Verriegelungselement (26). Weiterhin ist ein Steuerelement (24) vorgesehen, das das Ver- und Entriegeln von Sperrelement (16) und Verriegelungselement (26) in Abhängigkeit der Spannung des Zugseils (28) steuert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/00; E06B 9/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 53/00 (2006.01); E05C 21/02 (2006.01); E05D 13/00 (2006.01); E06B 9/86 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01); E06B 9/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 13/006 (2013.01); E05B 53/003 (2013.01); E05D 13/00 (2013.01); E06B 9/86 (2013.01); E05F 15/686 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01); E06B 2009/805 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19839630 A1 20000302; EP 0984125 A1 20000308; PL 335152 A1 20000313

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040511

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI