Global Patent Index - EP 0984126 A2

EP 0984126 A2 2000-03-08 - Guiding device for a sliding door

Title (en)

Guiding device for a sliding door

Title (de)

Führungsanordnung für eine Schiebetür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage pour une porte coulissante

Publication

EP 0984126 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810646 A

Priority

CH 179998 A

Abstract (en)

A method for fitting a sliding door has the top of the door fitted with rollers and hung into an over head rail. The bottom of the door is fitted with guide rollers which locate into the underside of a guide track beside the plane of the door. Each bottom roller (15) is fitted to the horizontal flange of an L-shaped support plate (19) whose vertical flange (21) is mounted on a support bracket (23) with some vertical movement. A ratchet (37) grips the fitting in the raised position. To hang the door the fitter merely pulls the lower roller fittings into the down position and fits the door. The door is secured by clicking up the lower roller fittings. Removal is in the reverse procedure.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Führungsanordnung ist die Führungsrolle (15) auf dem horizontalen Schenkel (19) eines L-förmigen Elements (21) aufgesetzt. Der vertikale Schenkel (23) der Tragplatte (21) ist in einer Befestigungsplatte (25) vertikal verschiebbar geführt. Rastmittel (37) halten die Tragplatte (21) nach deren Hochschieben in der oberen Position fest. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/08 (2013.01); E05D 15/063 (2013.01); E05D 15/0656 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 69408844 T2 19980625 - SOGAL FRANCE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984126 A2 20000308; EP 0984126 A3 20010221; EP 0984126 B1 20150902

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAWA SLIDING SOLUTIONS AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EKU AG, SIRNACH, CH

- Document: DE 59915433

2017-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59915433

- Representative's name: MAUCHER JENKINS, DE

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160603

2016-06-03 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59915433

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2015-10-15 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59915433

2015-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2015-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2015-06-10 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150515

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2001-12-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI