Global patent index - EP 0984127 A1

EP 0984127 A1 2000-03-08 - Running mechanism for a sliding door

Title (en)

Running mechanism for a sliding door

Title (de)

Laufwerks-Anordnung für eine Schiebetür

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de roulement pour porte coulissante

Publication

EP 0984127 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810648 A

Priority

CH 180098 A

Abstract (en)

A spanner engagement point for adjustment of the eccentric disk (15) is provided and a fixture plate (31) has a cylindrical projection for insertion in a pot bore (35) in the sliding door (9). A recess is provided for the roller bearer. The roller bearer (13) with the eccentric disk fixed to it is height-adjustably clamped to the fixture plate. In a tapped bore in the eccentric disk a securing screw generates the roller bearer and can be tightened to secure the eccentric disk. The roller bearer in the cylindrical projection has a cage for accommodation of the eccentric disk, the walls of which are radially elastically formed.

Abstract (de)

Die Laufwerks-Anordnung für eine Schiebetür (9) umfasst einen Rollenträger (13), welcher durch eine Exzenterscheibe (15) bezüglich der Schiebetür (9) vertikal justierbar ist. Die Justierung erfolgt mit einem Werkzeug, z.B. einem Imbusschlüssel, durch Drehen der Exzenterscheibe (15). Nach der Justierung kann mit einer in einem Gewinde (20) an der Exzenterscheibe (15) gelagerten Arretierschraube (19) die eingestellte Position fixiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/0634 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/638 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/64 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/296 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/3816 (2013.01); Y10T 16/3834 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984127 A1 20000308; EP 0984127 B1 20090506; DE 59915017 D1 20090618; ES 2327368 T3 20091028; JP 2000104444 A 20000411; US 6185784 B1 20010213

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140709

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130329

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110711

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100209

2009-10-28 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2327368

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2009-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59915017

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-06-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2009-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE

2009-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030930

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000826

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI