Global Patent Index - EP 0984129 A2

EP 0984129 A2 2000-03-08 - Locking support lever

Title (en)

Locking support lever

Title (de)

Niveauschaltsperre

Title (fr)

Levier de support avec dispositif de blocage

Publication

EP 0984129 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115305 A

Priority

DE 19839409 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19839409C1] The pivot lever (5) has a long hole (20), in which a polygon (19) of the bearing bolt (7) engages. For a relative movement the longitudinal extent of the polygon is smaller than the length of the long hole and the pivot lever is held on the bearing bolt by means of a fixture device (23) fixing its relative displacement position from the bearing bolt.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Niveauschaltsperre für den Flügelrahmen eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen, mit einem am Flügelrahmen befestigbaren Lagerteil, an dem ein Schwenkhebel (5) mittels eines einen Durchbruch des Lagerteils durchgreifenden, drehfest mit dem Schwenkhebel verbundenen Lagerbolzens (7) schwenkbar angeordnet ist, der auf der Rückseite des Lagerteils einen Treibstangensperrvorsprung aufweist, die sich dadurch auszeichnet, daß der Schwenkhebel (5) ein Langloch (20) aufweist, in das ein Mehrkant (19) des Lagerbolzens (7) eingreift, wobei für eine Relativverschiebung die Längserstreckung des Mehrkants (19) kleiner als die Länge des Langlochs (20) ist, und daß der Schwenkhebel (5) mittels einer seine relative Verschiebestellung vom Lagerbolzen (7) fixierenden Feststelleinrichtung (23) am Lagerbolzen (7) gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/526; E05F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/526 (2006.01); E05F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 7/06 (2013.01); E05D 15/526 (2013.01); E05D 2015/5266 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/686 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/322 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19839409 C1 19991007; AT 303497 T 20050915; EP 0984129 A2 20000308; EP 0984129 A3 20011107; EP 0984129 B1 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090909

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AG

- Free text: ROTO FRANK AG#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROTO FRANK AG#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE)

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2002-08-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH FR IT LI

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI