Global Patent Index - EP 0984136 A1

EP 0984136 A1 2000-03-08 - Double-sided centrifugal-centripetral turbine

Title (en)

Double-sided centrifugal-centripetral turbine

Title (de)

Doppelseitige Zentrifugal- Zentripedalturbine

Title (fr)

Turbine double-face, centrifugale-centripedale

Publication

EP 0984136 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98116484 A

Priority

EP 98116484 A

Abstract (en)

A centrifugal-centripetal turbine which has a turbine wheel provided with circumferentially mounted blades on both its proximal side and its distal side. The radial and tangential components of the velocity of the working fluid are reversed in a chamber, radially beyond the outer edge of the turbine wheel that is separated from the turbine wheel by a barrier to inhibit frictional interaction between the working fluid and the turbine wheel. All parts of the turbine are designed to be fabricated by casting. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 1/06; F01D 1/02; F01D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 1/02 (2006.01); F01D 1/06 (2006.01); F01D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 1/06 (2013.01); F01D 1/02 (2013.01); F01D 15/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984136 A1 20000308

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020408

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI