Global Patent Index - EP 0984138 A2

EP 0984138 A2 2000-03-08 - Turbomachine with shaft cooling

Title (en)

Turbomachine with shaft cooling

Title (de)

Strömungsmaschine mit gekühlter Rotorwelle

Title (fr)

Turbomachine avec arbre refroidie

Publication

EP 0984138 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810710 A

Priority

DE 19839592 A

Abstract (en)

The cooling blades (12) incorporate air guide channels which in the area of the blade points (15) issue into blow-out apertures (14). Cooling air (K) is thrust out of the blow-out apertures (14) and comes into contact with the rotor shaft (18) at high speed.

Abstract (de)

Strömungsmaschine, insbesondere Verdichter einer Gasturbine, mit Laufschaufeln (11) und Leitschaufeln (12), bei der einzelne oder sämtliche Leitschaufeln (12) als Kühlschaufeln ausgebildet sind. Die Kühlschaufeln (12) weisen Luftführungskanäle (13) auf, die im Bereich der Schaufelspitzen (15) in Ausblaseöffnungen (14) münden. Kühlluft (K) wird durch die Ausblaseöffnungen (14) ausgestoßen und trifft auf eine Rotorwelle (18) mit hoher Geschwindigkeit auf. Die hierdurch erzielbare Kühlwirkung ist optimal und führt darüber hinaus zu einer Anhebung des Verdichterwirkungsgrades und der Pumpgrenze. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/08; F01D 5/18; F01D 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/08 (2006.01); F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 11/10 (2006.01); F01D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/16 (2013.01); F01D 5/08 (2013.01); F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F01D 11/10 (2013.01); F05D 2260/201 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19839592 A1 20000302; DE 59912702 D1 20051201; EP 0984138 A2 20000308; EP 0984138 A3 20020123; EP 0984138 B1 20051026; US 6224328 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59912702

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912702

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-01-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912702 P 20051201

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIGAND, BERNHARD, DR.

2005-10-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FITZSIMONS, CONOR, DR.

2005-10-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAPPIS, WOLFGANG

2005-10-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WETTSTEIN, HANS, DR.

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIGAND, BERNHARD, DR.

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FITZSIMONS, CONOR, DR.

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAPPIS, WOLFGANG

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WETTSTEIN, HANS, DR.

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI