Global Patent Index - EP 0984143 A3

EP 0984143 A3 2001-01-10 - Improvements to rotary pumps

Title (en)

Improvements to rotary pumps

Title (de)

Rotationspumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe rotative

Publication

EP 0984143 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99306909 A

Priority

GB 9819261 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0984143A2] A coolant pump for an I.C. engine comprises a pump cavity housing an impeller rotatable about an axis, the impeller axis being located coaxially with the rotational axis of the crankshaft of the engine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 5/10; F04D 5/00; F04D 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/12 (2006.01); F01P 5/10 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04D 5/00 (2006.01); F04D 13/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/041 (2006.01); F04D 29/043 (2006.01); F04D 29/047 (2006.01); F04D 29/62 (2006.01); F16D 27/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/047 (2013.01); F01P 5/10 (2013.01); F04D 5/002 (2013.01); F04D 13/027 (2013.01); F04D 29/0413 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984143 A2 20000308; EP 0984143 A3 20010110; AU 4484899 A 20000316; BR 9904041 A 20000919; CA 2281342 A1 20000303; CN 1246580 A 20000308; GB 2341205 A 20000308; GB 9819261 D0 19981028; GB 9920361 D0 19991103; ID 25731 A 20001102; JP 2000080919 A 20000321; KR 20000022854 A 20000425; NO 994269 A 20000306; NO 994269 D0 19990902; TW 429285 B 20010411; ZA 9905664 B 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI