Global patent index - EP 0984155 A2

EP 0984155 A2 2000-03-08 - Synthetic resin-made intake manifold and manufacturing method thereof

Title (en)

Synthetic resin-made intake manifold and manufacturing method thereof

Title (de)

Einlasskrümmer aus Kunststoff und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Collecteur d'admission en résine synthétique et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0984155 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99116784 A

Priority

JP 24698698 A

Abstract (en)

A synthetic resin-made intake manifold including a volumetric air-intake section communicating with an intake air supply source through an inlet pipe and a plurality of outlet pipes for connecting the volumetric air-intake section to cylinders of an internal combustion engine is fabricated by injection molding, by applying the die rotary injection method or die slide injection method, the volumetric air-intake section and the outlet pipes respectively, thereafter, assembling them together and joining into unity, so that a synthetic resin-made intake manifold adapted for efficient production and flexible designing or including outlet pipes of a complex shape is obtained. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/104

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/26 (2006.01); B29C 45/00 (2006.01); B29C 45/04 (2006.01); B29C 45/14 (2006.01); B29C 45/32 (2006.01); B29C 65/00 (2006.01); B29C 65/06 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/104 (2006.01); B29L 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 66/54 (2013.01); B29C 45/0062 (2013.01); B29C 65/06 (2013.01); B29C 66/1312 (2013.01); B29C 66/301 (2013.01); B29C 66/542 (2013.01); B29C 66/543 (2013.01); B29C 66/8322 (2013.01); F02M 35/10052 (2013.01); F02M 35/10072 (2013.01); F02M 35/10078 (2013.01); F02M 35/10111 (2013.01); F02M 35/10131 (2013.01); F02M 35/10144 (2013.01); F02M 35/10321 (2013.01); F02M 35/10347 (2013.01); F02M 35/1036 (2013.01); F02M 35/112 (2013.01); B29K 2995/0001 (2013.01); B29L 2031/7492 (2013.01); F05C 2225/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984155 A2 20000308; EP 0984155 A3 20001129; EP 0984155 B1 20080206; DE 69938087 D1 20080320; DE 69938087 T2 20090129; JP 2000071281 A 20000307; JP 3394192 B2 20030407; KR 100337678 B1 20020522; KR 20000022817 A 20000425; US 6363900 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69938087

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140808

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-02-03 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20100112

2009-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081107

2008-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69938087

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-02-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIKYONISHIKAWA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIHATSU MOTOR CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040518

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: G P DAIKYO CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIHATSU MOTOR CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990831

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI