Global Patent Index - EP 0984159 A2

EP 0984159 A2 2000-03-08 - Fuel injector with stroke limitation

Title (en)

Fuel injector with stroke limitation

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzdüse mit Hubbegrenzung

Title (fr)

Injecteur de carburant avec limitation de course

Publication

EP 0984159 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117143 A

Priority

DE 19839632 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel injection nozzle incorporates a nozzle body (1) with a control needle (4) inside it. The body fits onto a holder (2) containing a longitudinally-movable EM or piezoelectric actuator rod (5) which pushes against an intermediate strut (6). There is a needle lift limiting device (9) which consists of a ring (41) which is engaged by an enlarged head (61) on the intermediate strut. The ring is accommodated in a groove (24) at the end of the holder and limits the movement of the strut in the direction of the nozzle body. There is a coil spring (24) which presses against the enlarged end of the strut and urges it towards the nozzle control needle.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kraftstoffeinspritzdüse, die sich aus einem Düsenkörper (1) und einem damit verspannten Düsenhalter (2) zusammensetzt, weist eine Hubbegrenzungseinrichtung (9) für eine Düsennadel (4) im Düsenkörper (1) auf, die in einer Aussparung (24) angeordnet ist, die in der Anliegefläche zwischen dem Düsenkörper und dem Düsenhalter ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/161 (2013.01); F02M 61/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19839632 A1 20000302; EP 0984159 A2 20000308; EP 0984159 A3 20030129; EP 0984159 B1 20040728

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910050

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910050

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI