Global Patent Index - EP 0984164 A2

EP 0984164 A2 2000-03-08 - Diaphragm pump

Title (en)

Diaphragm pump

Title (de)

Membrankolbenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à membrane

Publication

EP 0984164 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113882 A

Priority

DE 19840365 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has a pump head divided into components forming the pump chambers and covers as standard units to assemble a pump in a variety of configurations in a compact structure. The membrane piston pump has at least two pump chambers (4) divided by a membrane (3) for fitting to a pump assembly with a number of pistons (1). The pump head, with the membranes and pump chambers and covers, is divided into pump head components (5a-5c) with one more than the number of chambers. The pump head components are next to each other in a row, where alternate units (5b) form the cover for the preceding component (5a) with the chamber (4) for the preceding unit (5a) when fitted in place. The membranes (3) are tensed between the pump head components (5a-5c), parallel to the stroke axes of the pistons (1), on a plane at right angles to the end side of the assembly formed by the pump heads (5a-5c).

Abstract (de)

Die Membrankolbenpumpe mit n (mindestens zwei) durch je eine Membran (3) begrenzten Förderkammern (4) zum Anbau an ein Triebwerk mit n Kolben (1), weist einen Pumpenkopf (5) mit den Membranen, den Förderkammern und mit Deckeln auf, der in n+1 Pumpenkopfelemente (5a-5c) aufgeteilt ist. Die Pumpenkopfelemente sind derart nebeneinander in Reihe angeordnet, daß das jeweils zweite Pumpenkopfelement (5b) den Deckel für das vorgeschaltete Pumpenkopfelement (5a) bildet und die Förderkammer (4) für dieses vorgeschaltete Pumpenkopfelement (5a) aufweist, an dem es angebaut ist. Die Membranen (3) sind zwischen den Pumpenkopfelementen (5a-5c) eingespannt und sie sind im wesentlichen parallel zur Längsachse, d.h. zur Hubachse der Kolben (1) ausgerichtet. Die Ebenen, in denen die Membranen liegen, stehen senkrecht auf der Stirnfläche, an der der durch die einzelnen Pumpenkopfelemente (5a-5c) gebildete Pumpenkopf befestigt ist. Hierdurch ist eine äußerst kompakte Bauweise möglich. Nach Art eines Baukastens lassen sich aus einer Vielzahl gleicher bzw. sehr ähnlicher Pumpenkopfelemente verschiedene Membrankolbenpumpen auch mit unterschiedlichen Abmessungen aufbauen, so daß insgesamt eine preiswerte Konstruktion geschaffen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/067

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/107 (2006.01); F04B 9/115 (2006.01); F04B 43/00 (2006.01); F04B 43/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/0009 (2013.01); F04B 43/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984164 A2 20000308; EP 0984164 A3 20010328; EP 0984164 B1 20050420; DE 19840365 A1 20000309; ES 2241214 T3 20051016; JP 2000080984 A 20000321; JP 4243390 B2 20090325; US 6174144 B1 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911929

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2013-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911929

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER, VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BRAN + LUEBBE GMBH

- Free text: BRAN + LUEBBE GMBH#WERKSTRASSE 4#22844 NORDERSTEDT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BRAN + LUEBBE GMBH#WERKSTRASSE 4#22844 NORDERSTEDT (DE)

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2241214 T3

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911929 P 20050525

2005-05-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 43/067 A, 7F 04B 43/06 B

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI