Global patent index - EP 0984241 A1

EP 0984241 A1 2000-03-08 - Radiator for heating system with fluid circulation

Title (en)

Radiator for heating system with fluid circulation

Title (de)

Radiator für Heizungsanlage mit Flüssigkeitsumlauf

Title (fr)

Radiateur pour installation de chauffage à circulation de fluide

Publication

EP 0984241 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98870189 A

Priority

EP 98870189 A

Abstract (en)

The radiator section (1), equipped with couplings (10) for tubes linked to another section above it, has connectors (16, 18) for joining it to another radiator section located end to end with it and contains at least two parallel heating fluid distribution channels (2, 4). The channels are linked by compensating chambers (5) at the ends of the section which can be fitted with separators to give a more complex fluid trajectory, while grooves (14) in the section ends are designed to receive seals between adjacent sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/047 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0221 (2013.01); F28D 1/0475 (2013.01); F28D 1/05333 (2013.01); F28F 9/262 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0035 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0036 (2013.01); F28F 2220/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984241 A1 20000308; EP 0984241 B1 20000524; AT 193371 T 20000615; DE 69800161 D1 20000629; DE 69800161 T2 20010125; ES 2150309 T3 20001116

INPADOC legal status

2008-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 4

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *GENEBREV

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040904

2005-09-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050903

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040903

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *GENEBREV

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040904

2004-09-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2003-10-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031015

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031010

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150309

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193371

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990216

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI