Global Patent Index - EP 0984336 A1

EP 0984336 A1 2000-03-08 - A device for large format printing comprising a single central conditioning unit for controlling and monitoring the condition of the developer

Title (en)

A device for large format printing comprising a single central conditioning unit for controlling and monitoring the condition of the developer

Title (de)

Druckgerät für grosse Formate mit einer einzelnen zentralen Tonerkontroll- und überwachungseinheit

Title (fr)

Appareil d'impression pour imprimer à grand format avec une seule unité centrale de contrôle et de surveillance de toner

Publication

EP 0984336 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203008 A

Priority

EP 98203008 A

Abstract (en)

A large format , single pass printer, having a printing width (PW) for printing a toner image on a substrate, the substrate having a width (WS) and a length (LS), wherein, a number n, equal to or larger than 2, of printing engines each with a printing width PWEi, smaller than said printing width PW is provided, said number n being chosen such that <MATH> characterised in that i) a single central conditioning unit for controlling and monitoring the condition of the developer is provided, and ii) said central unit is further equipped for circulating said developer to all of said n printing engines and back to said central unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08; G03G 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/385 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01); G03G 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/346 (2013.01); G03G 15/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984336 A1 20000308; EP 0984336 B1 20010103; DE 69800473 D1 20010208; DE 69800473 T2 20010809; JP 2000085173 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020908

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020908

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010829

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800473 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI