Global patent index - EP 0984398 A1

EP 0984398 A1 2000-03-08 - Feeding device for at least two ticket printing tapes integrated in a transport ticket module

Title (en)

Feeding device for at least two ticket printing tapes integrated in a transport ticket module

Title (de)

Zuführvorrichtung für mindestens zwei in einem Fahrkartenausgabemodul integrierte Aufzeichnungsbänder

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'approvisionnement d'au moins deux bandes d'enregistrement integré à un module de délivrance d'un titre de transport

Publication

EP 0984398 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402110 A

Priority

FR 9811108 A

Abstract (en)

The device has two drive rollers (21A-21B,22A-22B,23A-23B,24A-24B) disposed on a fixed plate (25), each couple of rollers driving a particular recording band (A,B,C,D), and including a drive roller (21A,22A,23A,24A) and a roller (21B,22B,23B,24B) adapted to be selectively driven, by means of a satellite pinion (26) friction driven by a satellite carrier (29) with which it is in contact for being interposed turn by turn, and by demand, between a meshing gear (21C,22C,23C,24C) of this roller (21B,22B,23B,24B) and a toothed pinion (27) disposed at the exit end of a shaft (30) of the drive motor (28).

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif (20) d'approvisionnement d'au moins deux bandes d'enregistrement (A, B ; C, D) destiné à être intégré à un module (1) de délivrance d'au moins un type de titres de transport sous forme de tickets, obtenus par sectionnement de l'une des bandes (A, B ; C, D). Selon l'invention, ledit dispositif est constitué par un ensemble d'au moins deux couples de galets d'entraînement (21A-21B, 22A-22B, 23A-23B, 24A-24B), disposés sur une platine fixe (25), chaque couple de galets étant destinés à l'entraînement d'une bande d'enregistrement spécifique (A, B, C, D) et comprenant un galet mené (21A, 22A, 23A, 24A) et un galet (21B, 22B, 23B, 24B) apte à être sélectivement menant, par l'intermédiaire d'un pignon satellite (26) susceptible d'être entraîné par friction par un porte-satellite (29) avec lequel il est en contact pour être interposé tour à tour, et à la demande, entre une couronne d'engrènement (21C, 22C, 23C, 24C) dudit galet (21B, 22B, 23B, 24B) et un pignon denté (27) disposé à l'extrémité sortante d'un arbre (30) d'un moteur (28) d'entraînement unique et fixe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 3/02; G07B 1/02; G07B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 1/00 (2006.01); G07B 3/02 (2006.01); G07B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 1/00 (2013.01); G07B 3/02 (2013.01); G07B 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984398 A1 20000308; EP 0984398 B1 20021113; DE 69903897 D1 20021219; ES 2185299 T3 20030416; FR 2783073 A1 20000310; FR 2783073 B1 20001013

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130825

2014-09-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140905

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130824

2014-05-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130824

2014-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20130831

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2185299

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-02-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903897

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011205

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI