Global Patent Index - EP 0984409 A2

EP 0984409 A2 2000-03-08 - Slot machine with collection-based award feature

Title (en)

Slot machine with collection-based award feature

Title (de)

Spielautomat mit Bonusgewinnmöglichkeit

Title (fr)

Machine de jeu avec un gain bonus

Publication

EP 0984409 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99402172 A

Priority

US 14441398 A

Abstract (en)

A collection-based award system for a slot machine operable in a bonus round. The bonus round consists of a fixed number of spins of the reels of the slot machine. The outcome of each spin in the bonus round is represented by the display of a symbol group including various collection symbols and standard symbols. Each symbol group in the bonus round is evaluated for the presence of collection symbols and for the presence of standard symbols defining a standard winning combinations. Following the bonus round, a payoff is made to the player corresponding to the cumulative value of the collection symbols and standard winning combinations. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3267 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3244 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0874337 A1 19981028 - WMS GAMING INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984409 A2 20000308; EP 0984409 A3 20010926; AU 4732899 A 20000316; CA 2278949 A1 20000302; ZA 9905669 B 20000224

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-07-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI