Global Patent Index - EP 0984419 A1

EP 0984419 A1 2000-03-08 - Display device

Title (en)

Display device

Title (de)

Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 0984419 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116433 A

Priority

EP 98116433 A

Abstract (en)

Several display units (20) are rotatably arranged on the tractive device (10) and at least one unit is provided for rotating the display units. Each display unit contains a number of display bodies rotatably located on a display carrier which for its part is rotatably supported on the tractive device. Each deflector component (12) has a main shaft with a main chain wheel and a flat belt pulley, a parallel tension shaft with a tension belt pulley. Around the flat belt pulley and the tension belt pulley a tension belt is arranged, by means of which each display unit in the area of the deflector component (12) is radially outwardly movable against a centering spring from the center line of the tractive device, making possible a deflection process. An Independent claim is included for a method of manufacturing the same with may display elements.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anzeigevorrichtung mit einem Gehäuse und zumindest einem endlosen Zugmittel, das über mehrere Umlenkvorrichtungen geführt ist und über eine Antriebseinrichtung bewegbar ist, mit mehreren Anzeigeeinheiten, die drehbar an dem Zugmittel angeordnet sind, und zumindest einer Vorrichtung zum Drehen der Anzeigeeinheiten wobei jede Anzeigeeinheit eine Mehrzahl von Anzeigekörpern aufweist, die drehbar an einem Anzeigenträger gelagert sind, der seinerseits drehbar an dem Zugmittel abgestützt ist. Derartig aufgebaute Anzeigeeinheiten ermöglichen einen schnellen Wechsel von mindestens vier unterschiedlichen Bildanzeigen, was zu einer Erhöhung der Gesamtanzeigefläche und somit zu einer schneller Amortisation der Anschaffungskosten der Anzeigevorrichtung führt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 11/14; G09F 11/02; G09F 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/12 (2006.01); G09F 11/02 (2006.01); G09F 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/14 (2013.01); G09F 11/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984419 A1 20000308; AU 4473199 A 20000330; BR 9904058 A 20010320; CA 2280680 A1 20000229; JP 2000089697 A 20000331

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-08-27 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Ref Legal Event Code: 32PN

- Free Format Text: EPA FORM 2524 HARTMANN, REINHARD WILHELM JAECKELSTRASSE 10 91052 ERLANGEN DE

2002-02-20 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: HARTMANN, REINHARD WILHELM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HARTMANN, REINHARD WILHELM

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI