Global Patent Index - EP 0984420 A3

EP 0984420 A3 2001-03-21 - Device for the presentation of objects, in particular photos or similar

Title (en)

Device for the presentation of objects, in particular photos or similar

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Präsentation von Gegenständen, insbesondere von Fotos, Objekten oder dergl.

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la présentation d'objets, en particulier photos ou semblables

Publication

EP 0984420 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116648 A

Priority

DE 29815842 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0984420A2] Behind the transparent window-type area, the object to be presented is arranged within the box-shaped frame. The support plate (3) is entirely made of transparent material and the window-type area is limited by an opaque surface area (5). This latter area is formed by a colour application on the support plate (3). The opaque area (5) is formed by a surface material connected with the support plate (3). The material forming the opaque area is arranged on the front surface of the transparent support plate and the support plate on its front surface is covered with a protective plate of transparent material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 19/00; A47G 1/06; G09F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815842 U1 19981022; EP 0984420 A2 20000308; EP 0984420 A3 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030304

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09F 19/00 A, 7G 09F 1/12 B, 7A 47G 1/06 B

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEJA-BORCHARD, MONIKA

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI