Global Patent Index - EP 0984464 A3

EP 0984464 A3 2000-06-07 - Process for producing Fe-B-R based permanent magnet having a corrosion-resistant film

Title (en)

Process for producing Fe-B-R based permanent magnet having a corrosion-resistant film

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines auf R-Fe-B basiertes Dauermagnet mit korrosionsfeste Schicht

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un aimant permanent à base de R-Fe-B, pourvu d'un film résistant à la corrosion

Publication

EP 0984464 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99116399 A

Priority

  • JP 26247698 A
  • JP 27950798 A
  • JP 28662898 A
  • JP 30373198 A
  • JP 34991598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0984464A2] Producing a permanent magnet comprises placing the Fe-B-rare earth based magnet and metal pieces into a treating vessel for vibration and/or agitation. A metal film is formed on the magnet surface, with a sol solution applied to the metal film surface. The sol is produced by hydrolytic reaction, polymerizing metal compound and heat treating the resultant metal oxide film.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 41/02; H01F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0502475 A2 19920909 - KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al
  • [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 384 (E - 565) 15 December 1987 (1987-12-15)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 03 29 March 1996 (1996-03-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 03 27 February 1998 (1998-02-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984464 A2 20000308; EP 0984464 A3 20000607; EP 0984464 B1 20040728; DE 69915554 D1 20040422; DE 69915554 T2 20050127; DE 69918915 D1 20040902; DE 69918915 T2 20050728; HK 1026060 A1 20050422; MY 117187 A 20040531; MY 119680 A 20050630

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-07-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-06-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041028

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: NEOMAX CO., LTD.

2004-10-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-09-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NEOMAX CO., LTD.

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918915 P 20040902

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021011

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB NL

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI