Global Patent Index - EP 0984473 A1

EP 0984473 A1 2000-03-08 - Electrical rotary switch

Title (en)

Electrical rotary switch

Title (de)

Elektrischer Drehschalter

Title (fr)

Commutateur électrique rotatif

Publication

EP 0984473 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113197 A

Priority

DE 19839187 A

Abstract (en)

The switch has an actuating knob mounted in a housing that is mounted on one or two sides on at least three balls (5-7) in a cage and roller groove. Radial and axial wall rolling surfaces have contact segments (13) and contact paths (14) fed out of the housing via connecting elements and short circuited by one of the balls (5) in predefined switching positions. In the last switching position a contact between an additional contact segment (19) and at least two additional contact tracks (20,21) is made via the other two balls.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem bekannten Drehschalter mit einer Kontaktkugel sind die über die Kugel fliessenden Ströme begrenzt. Es besteht somit Bedarf, bei gegegebener feinfühliger Verstellung auch höhere Ströme schalten zu können, insbesondere in der letzten Schaltstellung eines Stufenschalters. Der neue Drehschalter weist daher die Merkmale auf, dass in der letzten Schaltstellung eine Kontaktierung zwischen einem zusätzlichen Kontaktsegment (19) und wenigstens zwei zusätzlichen Kontaktbahnen (20, 21) durch die einseitig oder zweiseitig verbleibenden anderen zwei Kugeln (6, 7) erfolgt. Hierdurch ist eine höhere Strombelastung des Drehschalters erreicht worden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/56 (2006.01); H01H 1/16 (2006.01); H01H 3/52 (2006.01); H01H 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/10 (2013.01); H01H 1/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984473 A1 20000308; EP 0984473 B1 20030402; DE 19839187 A1 20000309; DE 19839187 C2 20020711; ES 2193628 T3 20031101; JP 2000076949 A 20000314; US 6180901 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040709

2005-07-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-07-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193628 T3

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030718

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904816 P 20030508

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000114

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI