Global patent index - EP 0984475 A2

EP 0984475 A2 2000-03-08 - Method for performing a load detection in a multiple function electonic switch

Title (en)

Method for performing a load detection in a multiple function electonic switch

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Durchführung einer Lastdetektion bei einem elektronischen Mehrzweckschalter

Title (fr)

Procédé pour effectuer une détection de charge dans un commutateur électronique à plusieurs fonctions

Publication

EP 0984475 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115457 A

Priority

DE 19840356 A

Abstract (en)

The switch has two controllable load switching elements (3,4), a control arrangement (5,6) for the switching elements and arrangements (7,10) for local and/or remote control. The control arrangement performs a load detection after mains application and enables the load switching elements to be driven either in series or shutter switch modes depending on the detection result.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen elektronischen Mehrzweckschalter (1), der wahlweise als Serienschalter oder als Jalousieschalter einsetzbar ist, wobei der Mehrzweckschalter (1) zwei steuerbare Lastschaltglieder (3, 4), Steuerungsmittel (5, 6) zur Ansteuerung der Lastschaltglieder (3, 4), sowie Mittel (7, 10) zur Orts- und/oder Fernbedienung aufweist. Die Steuerungsmittel (5, 6) sind dafür eingerichtet, nach Anlegen der Netzspannung eine Lastdetektion durchzuführen und abhängig vom Detektionsergebnis eine Ansteuerung der Lastschaltglieder (3, 4) im Serienschaltbetrieb oder Jalousieschalterbetrieb freizugeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984475 A2 20000308; EP 0984475 A3 20001115; EP 0984475 B1 20061004; DE 19840356 A1 20000309; DE 59913891 D1 20061116

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ABB PATENT G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913891

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-11-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2006-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR PERFORMING A LOAD DETECTION IN A MULTIPLE FUNCTION ELECTONIC SWITCH

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010113

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI