Global Patent Index - EP 0984480 A3

EP 0984480 A3 2000-05-17 - Process for the fabrication of a display tube for the luminous sign technology and the illumination of advertising technique forms

Title (en)

Process for the fabrication of a display tube for the luminous sign technology and the illumination of advertising technique forms

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Anzeigeröhre für die Lichtanzeigetechnik und die Ausleuchtung von werbetechnischen Formen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tube d'affichage pour la technologie des enseignes lumineuses et l'illumination de formes technopublicitaires

Publication

EP 0984480 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117139 A

Priority

DE 19839965 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0984480A2] The method involves manually bending a glass tube washed with a fluorescent material into any shape; melting coil electrodes onto the ends of the deformed glass tube, whereby one coil electrode has a pump connector; alternately heating the tube with external energy to oxidize unwanted components, and to assist the formation of the coil electrodes and coils, and flushing the tube with gas via the pump connection; filling the tube with at least one gas or gas mixture; melting the pump connector off; and burning in the glass tube. Independent claims are also included for a system with a display tube and a method of operating a display tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/24; G09F 13/26; H05B 41/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/26 (2006.01); H01J 9/24 (2006.01); H01J 61/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/26 (2013.01); H01J 9/247 (2013.01); H01J 61/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984480 A2 20000308; EP 0984480 A3 20000517; EP 0984480 B1 20040317; DE 19839965 A1 20000309; DE 19839965 C2 20030417

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111021

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908856 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE FABRICATION OF A DISPLAY TUBE

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-05-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE FABRICATION OF A DISPLAY TUBE FOR THE LUMINOUS SIGN TECHNOLOGY AND THE ILLUMINATION OF ADVERTISING TECHNIQUE FORMS

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE FABRICATION OF A DISPLAY TUBE FOR THE LUMINOUS SIGN TECHNOLOGY AND THE ILLUMINATION OF ADVERTISING TECHNIQUE FORMS

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI