Global Patent Index - EP 0984516 A2

EP 0984516 A2 2000-03-08 - Electrical connector for a PCB

Title (en)

Electrical connector for a PCB

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder für eine gedruckte Schaltung

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique pour un circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 0984516 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202563 A

Priority

GB 9819227 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical connector (10) for mounting on a PCB (14) comprising a first housing (22) having a base wall (26) mountable on one side of the PCB; a second housing (24) having a base wall (28) mountable on the other side of the PCB, the base wall of the first housing and/or the second housing having an extension (32) which can be positioned in an aperture (30) in the PCB and engage the other housing; a first row (34) of electrical terminals (36) passing though, and secured in, the base walls and the or each extension to provide electric contacts (38) in the first housing and electric contacts (40) in the second housing; a second row (42) of electrical terminals (44) passing through, and secured in, the base wall of the first housing to provide electric contacts (46) in the first housing connectable with the printed circuit board; and a third row (48) of electrical terminals (50) passing through, and secured in, the base wall of the second housing to provide electric contacts (52) in the second housing connectable with the printed circuit board; wherein the second row is positioned on one side of the first row and the third row is positioned on the opposite side of the first row to the second row. Provides electrical connections to the PCB as well as through connections which bypass the PCB. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/22 (2006.01); H01R 11/01 (2006.01); H01R 12/52 (2011.01); H01R 12/71 (2011.01); B60R 16/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/526 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984516 A2 20000308; EP 0984516 A3 20020522; EP 0984516 B1 20071017; DE 69937325 D1 20071129; DE 69937325 T2 20080228; GB 2341281 A 20000308; GB 2341281 B 20020410; GB 9819227 D0 19981028

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-07-02 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69937325

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H01R0012160000

- IPC: H01R0012500000

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69937325

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130804

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120830

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PEAKS ISLAND LLC, DOVER, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC., TROY, MICH., US

- Document: DE 69937325

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69937325

- Representative's name: MURGITROYD & COMPANY, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69937325

- Representative's name: MURGITROYD & COMPANY, DE

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080128

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080117

2008-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937325 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2007-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061106

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI