Global patent index - EP 0984523 A1

EP 0984523 A1 2000-03-08 - Electrical connector with a cap

Title (en)

Electrical connector with a cap

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder mit Kappe

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique comprenant un capot

Publication

EP 0984523 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99117031 A

Priority

  • EP 99117031 A
  • EP 98116419 A

Abstract (en)

Described is an electrical connector with a housing (2) having contact cavities (4) with electrical contacts (5) to be secured to the electrical conductors of a cable, the said connector also having a cap (3) which can be mounted from the cable end and which fits tightly around the cable to protect the housing (2) from the ingress of dust and water, the cap (3) being provided with an integrated contact securing device (17) for securing the contacts (5) in the cavities (4) and consisting of two parts (12, 13) which can be joined together perpendicular to the plugging direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/56; H01R 13/516; H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/516 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/516 (2013.01); H01R 13/5205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984523 A1 20000308; EP 0984523 B1 20030122

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-12-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69904997

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI